LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1422
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1422
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1422
Compare Versions
AB1422 Chaptered October 4, 2013
AB1422 Enrolled September 16, 2013
AB1422 Amended August 26, 2013
AB1422 Amended July 8, 2013
AB1422 Amended June 19, 2013
AB1422 Amended June 4, 2013
AB1422 Amended April 15, 2013
AB1422 Introduced March 21, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB1422 Chaptered October 4, 2013
AB1422 Enrolled September 16, 2013
AB1422 Amended August 26, 2013
AB1422 Amended July 8, 2013
AB1422 Amended June 19, 2013
AB1422 Amended June 4, 2013
AB1422 Amended April 15, 2013
AB1422 Introduced March 21, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare