|
09/30/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 435, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/26/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2013
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2403.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2013
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1710.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) . Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|