Senate
|
08/29/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4966.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2014
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Wolk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2013
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1480.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|