|
10/01/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 463, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/01/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/26/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3334.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2401.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2013
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2013
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hill.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1479.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|