|
09/30/2014
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 58. Noes 19. Page 6082.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 2. Page 4418.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 17. Page 5227.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2014
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/17/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on E. & R. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/07/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 6.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/06/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|