California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1432 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 6, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2014

Amended

Bill August 4, 2014
Bill May 23, 2014
Bill May 7, 2014
Bill February 11, 2014