|
09/29/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 798, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2014
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6347.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6348.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 23 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2014
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4711.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2014
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5232.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) . Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2014
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/17/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/07/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 6.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/06/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|