Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 23. Page 5233.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) . Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2014
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 5.) (April 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2014
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/17/2014
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/07/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 6.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/06/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|