California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1439 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 6, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2014

Amended

Bill August 21, 2014
Bill August 4, 2014
Bill June 16, 2014
Bill March 24, 2014
Bill March 20, 2014