|
09/28/2014
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2014
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 8. Page 4654.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 24. Page 5286.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2014
|
Referred to Com. on ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/07/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 6.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/06/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|