|
09/26/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 594, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2014
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6239.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6241.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4616.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2014
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 10).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 2. Page 5021.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2014
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2014
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/17/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/07/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 6.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/06/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|