California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1453 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 9, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2014

Amended

Bill August 19, 2014
Bill August 4, 2014
Bill June 19, 2014
Bill April 22, 2014