|
09/27/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 665, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6030.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4370.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2014
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4597.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/10/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 9.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/09/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|