Assembly | 05/23/2014 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2014 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2014 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2014 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (May 1). | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2014 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2014 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2014 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 01/30/2014 | Referred to Com. on U. & C. | ||
Assembly | 01/10/2014 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 9. | ||
Assembly | 01/09/2014 | Read first time. To print. |