Assembly | 05/21/2014 | In committee: Set second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2014 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 04/30/2014 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2014 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2014 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Assembly | 01/14/2014 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 13. | ||
Assembly | 01/13/2014 | Read first time. To print. |