|
08/04/2014
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
07/21/2014
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5731.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4143.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2014
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4641.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2014
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/03/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/06/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on A. & A.R. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/14/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 13.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/13/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|