Assembly | 06/05/2014 | From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2014 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2014 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2014 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Assembly | 01/15/2014 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 14. | ||
Assembly | 01/14/2014 | Read first time. To print. |