|
07/10/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 114, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
07/10/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:15 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2014
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4143.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2014
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4756.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2014
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/15/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 14.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/14/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|