California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1509 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 14, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2014

Amended

Bill August 19, 2014
Bill March 25, 2014