LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1512
Draft Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1512
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1512
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
January 14, 2014
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
June 11, 2014
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
June 23, 2014
Compare
Amended
Bill
June 2, 2014
Compare
Bill
March 18, 2014
Compare