California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1517 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 15, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2014

Amended

Bill August 18, 2014
Bill May 23, 2014