California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1530 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2014

Amended

Bill August 4, 2014
Bill July 2, 2014
Bill June 17, 2014
Bill April 28, 2014
Bill March 28, 2014