|
09/30/2014
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 2. Page 6320.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2014
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6285.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4655.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 4. Page 5236.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) . Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (March 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 11). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/22/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/21/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|