California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1539 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 22, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2014

Amended

Bill August 19, 2014
Bill July 2, 2014
Bill June 10, 2014
Bill May 27, 2014
Bill April 22, 2014
Bill April 2, 2014