Assembly | 05/23/2014 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2014 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2014 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2014 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/06/2014 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2014 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 2. | ||
Assembly | 01/30/2014 | Read first time. To print. |