Senate
|
08/20/2014
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 23. Page 5365.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2014
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/05/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/06/2014
|
Referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/30/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|