|
09/15/2014
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2014
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4410.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2014
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5345.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2014
|
Referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/07/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 9.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/06/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|