Senate
|
06/25/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2014
|
In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 5290.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2014
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (March 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2014
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/07/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 9.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/06/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|