Assembly | 02/03/2014 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2014 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2013 | Measure version as amended on May 9 corrected. | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2013 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/29/2013 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2013 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 01/24/2013 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 23. | ||
Assembly | 01/23/2013 | Read first time. To print. |