|
09/15/2014
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2014
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 4726.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2014
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 23. Page 5290.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2014
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/07/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 9.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/06/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|