|
07/09/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 102, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:15 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2014
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4143.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2014
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4598.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2014
|
Referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/11/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/10/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|