LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1631
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1631
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1631
Action History
Assembly
04/23/2014
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Assembly
04/21/2014
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
Assembly
04/10/2014
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
Assembly
02/20/2014
Referred to Com. on INS.
Assembly
02/11/2014
From printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
Assembly
02/10/2014
Read first time. To print.