Assembly | 05/23/2014 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2014 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/23/2014 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on INS. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2014 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2014 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2014 | Referred to Com. on INS. | ||
Assembly | 02/12/2014 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. | ||
Assembly | 02/11/2014 | Read first time. To print. |