|
08/21/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 231, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4368.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5171.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/11/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|