|
09/30/2014
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 66. Noes 13. Page 6391.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 23 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 3. Page 4724.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2014
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 9. Page 4959.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (May 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2014
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/11/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|