Senate
|
08/25/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2014
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2014
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Berryhill.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2014
|
Referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4971.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2014
|
Referred to Com. on AGRI. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/11/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|