|
09/17/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 379, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/17/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4550.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2014
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4758.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2014
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/11/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|