|
09/30/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 880, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 21. Page 6446.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 23 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 10. Page 4728.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2014
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Ayes 55. Noes 21. Page 5325.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 16. Page 5346.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5220.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2014
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2014
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/11/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|