LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB166
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB166
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB166
Compare Versions
AB166 Chaptered August 26, 2013
AB166 Enrolled August 13, 2013
AB166 Amended June 5, 2013
AB166 Amended April 1, 2013
AB166 Amended March 11, 2013
AB166 Introduced January 23, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB166 Chaptered August 26, 2013
AB166 Enrolled August 13, 2013
AB166 Amended June 5, 2013
AB166 Amended April 1, 2013
AB166 Amended March 11, 2013
AB166 Introduced January 23, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare