California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1665 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 22, 2014

Amended

Bill June 26, 2014
Bill May 23, 2014
Bill April 24, 2014
Bill March 20, 2014