|
09/30/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 881, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2014
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6550.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6562.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 1. Page 4852.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2014
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4972.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2014
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2014
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|