California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1672 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2014

Amended

Bill August 22, 2014
Bill August 18, 2014
Bill April 24, 2014
Bill April 7, 2014