Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 7. Page 5172.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2014
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2014
|
Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|