California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1680 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 8, 2014

Chaptered

Bill August 21, 2014

Amended

Bill June 18, 2014
Bill March 11, 2014
Bill March 6, 2014