Assembly | 05/23/2014 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 04/30/2014 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2014 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2014 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 8). | ||
Assembly | 03/13/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 03/12/2014 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2014 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2014 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2014 | Read first time. To print. |