|
09/19/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 453, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2014
|
Enrolled measure version corrected.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6039.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4409.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 4283.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|