LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB17
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB17
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB17
Action History
Assembly
02/03/2014
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Assembly
01/31/2014
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
Assembly
04/08/2013
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Assembly
01/14/2013
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and JUD.
Assembly
12/04/2012
From printer. May be heard in committee January 3. Introduced measure version corrected.
Assembly
12/03/2012
Read first time. To print.