|
09/21/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 526, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 2. Page 6042.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4412.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2014
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2014
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Roth.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 10).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2014
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 2. Page 4710.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2014
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|