California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1732 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 21, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2014

Amended

Bill July 1, 2014
Bill June 15, 2014
Bill April 10, 2014