|
09/19/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 458, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6043.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4419.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5164.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2014
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|